The first government land office in Wisconsin north of Mineral Point was located at St. Croix Falls in 1848. Township plats were received, lands advertised and offered for sale in September, covering the ground where the cities of Stillwater and St. Paul are now located, and adjacent country. The office was removed to Stillwater in 1849, and the land district divided by the St. Croix river. The land office for the east side was located at Willow River in 1849, and there remained till 1860, when it was removed to St. Croix Falls. The following are the receivers and registers:
1848. Samuel Leach, receiver; Charles S. Whiting, register.
1849. Moses S. Gibson, receiver; T. D. Catlin, register.
1853. Otis Hoyt, receiver; John O. Henning, register.
1857. J. D. Reymert, receiver; J.B. Spencer, register:
1859. Orpheus Evarts, receiver; J. B. Spencer, register.
1861. Benj. W. Reynolds, receiver; Michael Field, register.
1864. Hiram Calkins, receiver; Michael Field, register.
1869. Fayette Allen, receiver; Michael Field, register.
1871. Joel F. Nason, receiver; Michael Field, register.
1884. Alvah A. Heald, receiver; Michael Field, register.
1887. Alvah H. Heald, receiver; Wm. M. Blanding, register.
The first entry in the new district, Aug. 17, 1849, was by W. S. Hungerford. Lot 4, Sec. 19, and Lots 1, 2, 3, Sec. 30, T. 34, R. 18, where the village of St. Croix now stands. The second entry was by George Brownell, Lot 3, Sec. 20, T. 24, R. 18. The oldest record to be found in the office is the proving up by James Purinton of his pre-emption, July 24, 1848. The first recorded correspondence is a letter from S. Leach, receiver, to Geo. W. Jones, surveyor general, Dubuque, Iowa. In June, 1863, under the receivership of Mr. Reynolds, the safe in the office was blown open with powder and the contents stolen. Some time afterward, in 1865, fifty land warrants and a bunch of keys from the articles missing were thrown in at the office window. They had the appearance of having been buried in the ground.
July 24, 1848. James Purinton, residence, St. Croix Falls. Lot 1, in east fractional part Sec. 23, T. 29 north, R. 20 west, and W. 1/2 of N. W. 1/4 and S. E. 1/4 of N. W. 1/4, Sec. 24, T. 29, R. 20, 137 70-100 acres; price, $1.25; cost, $172 12-100, silver; pre-emption act, 1841. This pre-emption is where the dam and mills have since been erected at North Hudson.
Aug. 12, 1848. Samuel Burkelo, Orange Walker and Hiram Berkey. Lots 7 and 8, west of river, Sec. 6, T. 31, R. 19, 108 25-100 acres; cost $135 43-100, 1/4 gold; pre-emption act, 1840 (Marine Mills).
Aug. 16, 1848. Richard Freeborn. West 1/2 of N. W. 1/4 and N. E. 1/4 of N. W. 1/4, and Lot 3, Sec. 12, T. 28, R. 23, St. Paul; pre-emption act, 1841.
The first land offered at public auction sale was Aug. 27, 1848.
4. Albert Henry Judd, Orange Walker, Samuel Burkelo, Hiram Berkey, George Baldwin Judd, Asa Parker were the purchasers of Lots 5 and 6, Sec. 7, T. 31, R. 19, west of river; cost, $106 46-100, gold.
5. Martin Mower, David B. Loomis; Lots 7 and 8, Sec. 29, T. 31, R. 19, west of river; cost, $54 81-100, 1/4 gold (now Arcola).
6. John Allen; Lots 4 and 5, Sec. 2, T. 29, R. 20, west of river; gold (Allen's Point, now South Stillwater).
7. Eleazer R. Steves; Lots 1 and 2, Sec. 14, T. 29, R. 20, east of river; gold, $9.66; silver, $54.85; $64 51-100 (now Hudson).
8 and 9. Stephen Harris; N. 1/2 of S. E. 1/4 and E. 1/2 of S. W. 1/4, Sec. 22, T. 29, R. 20.
10. Himan W. Greely; E. 1/2 of N. E. 1/4, Sec. 22, T. 29, R. 20, gold.
11 and 12. Albert N. Judd; W. 1/2 of S. E. 1/4 and E. 1/2 of S. W. 1/4, Sec. 22, T. 29, R. 20, gold.
13 and 14. Louis Massey; E. 1/2 of S. W. and Lots 1 and 2, Sec. 24, T. 29, R. 20, silver; east of Lake St. Croix (now Hudson).
15 and 16. Peter F. Bouchea, Lot 1, east of river, Sec. 25, T. 29, R. 20 and Lot 2, Sec. 25, T. 29, R. 20; gold, $63 22-100; silver, $10 – $73 22-100.
17 and 18. John O'Brien; Lot 3, Sec. 26, T. 29, R. 20 and W. 1/2 of S. W. 1/4, Sec. 26, T. 29, R. 20, silver and gold (now Lakeland).
19 and 20. Albert H. Judd; E. 1/2 of N. E. 1/4, and W. 1/2 of N. W. 1/4, Sec. 22, T. 29, R. 20, gold.
21. Himan W. Greely; W. 1/2 of N. E. 1/4, Sec. 22, T. 29, R. 20, gold.
The above are all the purchasers at the first sale of land in the valley at St. Croix Falls. Sale was continued from day to day until townships 25 to 31 of ranges 19 and 20 were offered, covering the settlement of St. Anthony Falls, St. Paul, Cottage Grove, and Point Douglas.
The United States land office was moved from St. Croix Falls to Stillwater in September, 1849. The first public sale of lands at Stillwater was Oct. 9, 1849. The office was held in Stillwater nine years. In October, 1858, it was moved to Cambridge, Isanti county; November 3d the first sale of lands was held at Cambridge. April 7, 1860, the office was burned, many valuable papers were destroyed, and many records were replaced from the archives at Washington. July 5, 1860, the office was moved to Sunrise, and Oct. 8, 1868, it was moved to Taylor's Falls, where it is at the present time (1888).
The records do not show the date of commission of any officer; we gather the dates as near as possible from recorded correspondence.
Governors: Henry Dodge, 1836-41; James Duane Doty, 1841-44; N. P. Talmadge, 1844-45; Henry Dodge, 1845-48.
Delegates to Congress: George W. Jones, 1836-37; James D. Doty, 1837-41; Henry Dodge, 1841-45; Morgan L. Martin, 1845-47; John H. Tweedy, 1847-48.
Chief Justice: Charles Dunn, 1836-48.
First Session, 1836 – Council: Thomas P. Burnett.6 (Rejected by a ruling of Gov. Dodge, and district left without representation.) House: James H. Lockwood, James B. Dallam.
Second Session, 1837 – House: Ira B. Brunson, Jean Brunet.7
Third Session, 1838 – House: Ira B. Brunson, Jean Brunet.
First Session, 1838 – Council: George Wilson. House: Alex. McGregor.8
Second Session, 1839 – Council: George Wilson. House: Alex. McGregor, Ira B. Brunson.
Third Session, 1839-40 – Council: Joseph Brisbois. House: Alex. McGregor, Ira B. Brunson.
Fourth Session, 1840 – Council: Charles J. Learned. House: Alex. McGregor, Ira B. Brunson.
First Session, 1840-41 – Council: Charles J. Learned. House: Alfred Brunsou, Joseph R. Brown.
Second Session, 1841-42 – Council: Charles J. Learned. House: Joseph R. Brown, Theophilus J. LaChapelle.
First Session, 1842-43 – Council: Theophilus La Chapelle. House: John H. Manahan.
Second Session, 1843-44 – Council: Theophilus La Chapelle. House: John H. Manahan.
Third Session, 1845 – Council: Wiram Knowlton. House: James Fisher.
Fourth Session, 1846 – Council: Wiram Knowlton. House: James Fisher.
First Session, 1847 – Council: Benj. F. Manahan. House: Joseph W. Furber.
Special Session, 1847 – Council: Benj. F. Manahan. House: Henry Jackson.
Second Session, 1848 – Council: Benj. F. Manahan. House: Henry Jackson.
First Constitutional Convention, Oct. 5, 1846 – Delegate from St. Croix county, Wm. Holcombe.
Second Constitutional Convention, Dec. 15, 1847 – Delegate from St. Croix county, George W. Brownell.
Governors: Nelson Dewey, 1848-52; L. J. Farwell, 1852-54; W. A. Barstow, 1854-56; Coles Bashford, 1856-58; Alex. W. Randall, 1858-62; Louis P. Harvey, 1862; Edward Salomen, 1862-64; James Q. Lewis, 1864-66; Lucius Fairchild, 1866-72; C. C. Washburn, 1872-74; Wm. R. Taylor, 1874-76; Harrison Luddington, 1876-78; Wm. E. Smith, 1878-82; Jeremiah Rusk, 1882-58.
Isaac P. Walker, June 8, 1848; Henry Dodge, June 8, 1848; Charles Durkee, Feb. 1, 1855; James R. Doolittle, Jan. 23, 1857; Timothy O. Howe, Jan. 23, 1861; Matt H. Carpenter, Jan. 26, 1869; Angus Cameron, Feb. 3, 1875; Philetus Sawyer, Jan. 26, 1881; John C. Spooner, Jan. 26, 1885.
From districts bordering on the St. Croix: Mason C. Darling, 1848-50; Orasmus Cole, 1850-52; Ben. C. Eastman, 1852-56; C. C. Washburn, 1856-62; Luther Hanchett, 1862-63; Walter D. McIndoe, 1863-68; C. C. Washburn, 1868-72; Jeremiah M. Rusk, 1874-78; Hiram L. Humphrey, 1878-84; Wm. T. Price, 1884-88; Nels P. Haugan, 1888.
District judges presiding in territory originally included in St. Croix county:
Wiram Knowlton, of Prairie du Chien, 1848-50; district – Crawford, Chippewa, St. Croix and La Pointe counties.
S. S. Fuller, of Hudson, 1850-60; district – Pierce, St. Croix, Polk, Douglas, and La Pointe counties.
Henry D. Barron, of North Pepin, 1860-61; district – Pierce, St. Croix, Polk, Douglas, Ashland, and Bayfield counties.
L. P. Weatherby, of Hudson, 1861-67; district – Pepin, Pierce, St. Croix, Polk, Burnett, Douglas, Bayfield, and Ashland counties.
Herman L. Humphrey, of Hudson, 1867-77; district – St. Croix, Pierce, Pepin, Dunn, and Barron counties.
Solon S. Clough, of Hudson, 1864-76; district – Polk, Burnett, Douglas, Ashland, and Bayfield counties.
R. P. Bundy, of Menomonie, 1876-85, re-elected until 1891; district – Buffalo, Dunn, Eau Claire, Pepin, Pierce; and St. Croix counties.
Henry D. Barron, of St. Croix Falls, 1876-82; district – Chippewa, Barron, Polk, Burnett, Douglas, Ashland, and Bayfield counties.
Solon S. Clough, of Superior, 1882-88; district – Ashland, Barron, Bayfield, Burnett, Chippewa, Douglas, Polk, and Washburn counties.
R. D. Marshall, of Chippewa Falls, 1888.
Representatives of territory originally included in St. Croix county:
First Session, 1848 – Senate: Daniel S. Fenton. Assembly: W. R. Marshall. (Seat successfully contested by Joseph Bowron.)
Second Session, 1849 – Senate: James Fisher. Assembly: Joseph Bowron.
Third Session, 1850 – Senate: James Fisher. Assembly: John S. Watrous.
Fourth Session, 1851 – Senate: Henry A. Wright. Assembly: John O. Henning.
Fifth Session, 1852 – Senate: Henry A. Wright. Assembly: Otis Hoyt.
Sixth Session, 1853 – Senate: Benj. Allen. Assembly: Orrin T. Maxson.
Seventh Session, 1854 – Senate: Benj. Allen. Assembly: Wm. M. Torbert.
Eighth Session, 1855 – Senate: Wm. T. Gibson. Assembly: Smith R. Gunn.
Ninth Session, 1856 – Senate: Wm. T. Gibson. Assembly: Almon D. Gray.
Tenth Session, 1857 – Senate: Wm. Wilson. Assembly: Orin T. Maxson.
Eleventh Session, 1858 – Senate: Daniel Mears. House: James B. Gray, Lucius Cannon.
Twelfth Session; 1859 – Senate: Daniel Mears. House: Moses S. Gibson. Mr. Gibson's seat successfully contested by M. W. McCracken.
Thirteenth Session, 1860 – Senate: Charles B. Cox. House: Asaph Whittlesey.
Fourteenth Session, 1861 – Senate: Charles B. Cox. House: John Comstock.
Fifteenth Session, 1862 – Senate: H. L. Humphrey. House: George R. Stuntz, James W. Beardsley. Mr. Beardsley was elected speaker of the house.
Sixteenth Session, 1863 – Senate: N. L. Humphrey. House: Henry D. Barron, Charles B. Cox.
Seventeenth Session, 1864 – Senate: Austin H. Young. House: Henry D. Barron, Joseph S. Elwell.
Eighteenth Session, 1865 – Senate: Austin H. Young. House: Amos S. Gray (successfully contested by A. C. Stuntz). House: Marcus A. Fulton.
Nineteenth Session, 1866 – Senate: Marcus A. Fulton. House: Henry D. Barron, William J. Copp. Mr. Barron elected speaker of the assembly.
Twentieth Session, 1867 – Senate: Marcus A. Fulton. House: Henry D. Barron, John D. Trumbull, H. L. Wadsworth.
Twenty-first Session, 1868 – Senate: Wm. J. Copp. House: Henry D. Barron, Eleazer Holt, Marcus A. Fulton.
Twenty-second Session, 1869 – Senate: Wm. J. Copp. House: Henry D. Barron, Edward H. Ives, Charles D. Parker.
Twenty-third Session, 1870 – Senate: Edward H. Ives. House: Samuel B. Dressor, Oliver S. Powell, Charles D. Parker.
Twenty-fourth Session, 1871 – Senate: Edward H. Ives. House: Samuel S. Vaughn, Oliver S. Powell, Ruel K. Fay.
Twenty-fifth Session, 1872 – Senate: Joseph E. Irish. House: Henry D. Barron, Oliver S. Powell, John C. Spooner.
Twenty-sixth Session, 1873 – Senate: Joseph E. Irish. House: Henry D. Barron, speaker; James H. Persons, David C. Fulton.
Twenty-seventh Session, 1874 – Senate: Henry D. Barron. House: Samuel S. Fifield, James H. Persons, Harvey S. Clapp.
Twenty-eighth Session, 1875 – Senate: Henry D. Barron, House: Samuel S. Fifield, Thomas S. Nelson, Philo Q. Boyden.
Twenty-ninth Session, 1876 – Senate: Henry D. Barron. House: Samuel S. Fifield, speaker; Christopher L. Taylor, Philo Q. Boyden.
Thirtieth Session, 1877 – Senate: Samuel S. Fifield. House: Woodbury S. Grover, Ellsworth Burnett, Guy W. Dailey.
Thirty-first Session, 1878 – Senate: Dana R. Bailey. House: Canute Anderson, Charles A. Hawn, James Hill.
Thirty-second Session, 1879 – Senate: Dana R. Bailey. House: Wm. J. Vincent, Nils P. Haugen, James Hill.
Thirty-third Session, 1880 – Senate: Sam S. Fifield. House: Nils P. Haugen, James Hill, Lars L. Gunderson.
Thirty-fourth Session, 1881 – Senate: Sam S. Fifield. Assembly: Geo. D. McDill, Franklin L. Gibson, Merton Herrick.
Thirty-fifth Session, 1882 – Senate: James Hill. Assembly: Geo. D. McDill, Franklin L. Gibson, speaker; Olof A. Sangestad.
Thirty-sixth Session, 1883 – Senate: James Hill. Assembly: Canute Anderson, John D. Putnam, Geo. D. McDill, James Johnston.
Thirty-seventh Session, 1884 – Senate: Joel F. Nason. Assembly: Hans B. Warner, Frank M. Nye, Thomas Porter; Charles S. Taylor, J. B. Thayer.
(For thirty-eighth and thirty-ninth Sessions see Addenda.)
Governors: Alexander Ramsey, from June 1, 1849, to May 15, 1853; Willis A. Gorman, from May 15, 1853, to April 23, 1857; Samuel Medary, from April 23, 1857, to May 24, 1858.
Delegates to Congress: Henry H. Sibley, Jan. 15, 1849, to March 4, 1853; Henry M. Rice, Dec. 5, 1853, to March 4, 1857; W. W. Kingsbury, Dec. 7, 1857, to May 11, 1858.
Chief Justices: Aaron Goodrich, June 1, 1849, to Nov. 13, 1851; Jerome Fuller, Nov. 13, 1851, to Dec. 16, 1852; Henry Z. Hayner, Dec. 16, 1852, to April 7, 1853 (Judge Hayner never presided at a single term and gave but one decision, which was to pronounce the prohibition law unconstitutional); William H. Welch, April 7, 1853, to May 24, 1858.
Associate Justices: David Cooper, June 1, 1849, to April 7, 1853; Bradly B. Meeker, June 1, 1849, to April 7, 1853; Andrew G. Chatfield, April 7, 1853, to April 23, 1857; Moses G. Sherburne, April 7, 1853, to April 13, 1857; R. R. Nelson, April 23, 1857, to May 24, 1858; Charles E. Flandrau, April 23, 1857, to May 24, 1858.
Upon the basis of this population the governor established the following legislative districts:
First district: St. Croix precinct, extending on the west side of the St. Croix and Mississippi rivers to the Iowa line; Second district: Stillwater; Third district: St. Paul; Fourth district: Marine Mills and the country north to the British possessions; Fifth district: St. Anthony Falls; Sixth district: The country east of the Mississippi not embraced in the Fourth district, and extending north to the British possessions; Seventh district: All the territory on the west of the Mississippi river not embraced in the sixth and first districts.
Council: David Olmsted, president; district No. 1, James S. Norris; No. 2, Samuel Burkelo; No. 3, William H. Forbes, James McC. Boal; No. 4, David B. Loomis; No. 5, John Rollins; No. 6, David Olmsted, William Sturgis; No. 7, Martin McLeod.
House: Joseph W. Furber, of Cottage Grove, speaker; district No. 1, Joseph W. Furber, James Wells; No. 2, M. S. Wilkinson, Sylvanus Trask, Mahlon Black; No. 3, Benj. W. Brunson, Henry Jackson, John J. Dewey, Parsons K. Johnson; No. 4, Henry N. Setzer; No. 5, William R. Marshall, William Dugas; No. 6, Jeremiah Russell, Allan Morrison, Lorenzo A. Babcock, Thomas A. Holmes; No. 7, Alexis Bailly, Gideon H. Pond.
The limits of this work preclude the insertion of a complete list of the entire State, and we give, therefore, the representation of the St. Croix valley.
Council: James Norris, Samuel Burkelo, D. B. Loomis, president. House: John A. Ford, Michael E. Ames, speaker; Jesse Taylor, John D. Ludden.
Council: Elam Greely, David B. Loomis. House: Jesse Taylor, Mahlon Black, Martin Leavitt, John D. Ludden.
Council: Elam Greely, David B. Loomis. House: N. Green Wilcox, Albert Stimson, Caleb Truax, John D. Ludden.
Council: Albert Stimson, John E. Mower. House: John Fisher, Wm. McKusick, Robert Watson, N. C. D. Taylor, speaker.
Council: Albert Stimson, John E. Mower. House: James B. Dixon, William Willim, James Norris, Samuel Register.
Council: John D. Ludden, Henry N. Setzer. House: James S. Norris, Abraham Van Voorhes, N. C. Taylor, Henry A. Jackman.
Council: John D. Ludden, Henry N. Setzer. House: Elam Greely, Mahlon Black, Joseph W. Furber, speaker; L. K. Stannard.
The legislature of 1852 passed a prohibition law and submitted it to the people of the Territory, who adopted it by a vote of 853 for to 622 against. This law was declared unconstitutional by Judge Hayner on the ground that it was unconstitutional to submit a law to the vote of the people. After rendering this decision he resigned his office.
At a second appointment in 1855 the counties of Washington, Chisago, Superior, Itasca, and Doty were included in the St. Croix district. A special session was held in May, 1857, to accept and make provision to use the magnificent railway land grant donated by Congress.
In accordance with the enabling act of Congress, passed March 3, 1857, delegates were elected and met in convention at the capital on the second Monday of July, 1857.
Washington county: Wm. Holcombe, James S. Norris, Henry N. Setzer, Gould T. Curtis, Charles E. Leonard, Charles J. Butler, Newinton Gilbert, R. H. Sanderson.
Chisago county: P. A. Cedarstam, Charles F. Lowe, Lucas K. Stannard, W. H. C. Folsom.
The convention continued in session from July 13 to Aug. 29, 1857, and although divided into two wings, accomplished considerable work, such as preparing duplicate state constitutions and redistricting the State. The St. Croix valley was redistricted as follows:
First district, Washington county: Twenty-fifth district, Chisago, Pine and Isanti counties.
Henry H. Sibley, May 24, 1858, to Jan. 2, 1860; Alexander Ramsey, Jan. 2, 1860, to July 10, 1863; Henry A. Swift, July 10, 1863, to Jan. 11, 1864; Stephen Miller, Jan. 11, 1864, to Jan. 8, 1866; William R. Marshall, Jan. 8, 1866, to Jan. 9, 1870; Horace Austin, Jan. 9, 1870, to Jan. 7, 1874; Cushman K. Davis, Jan. 7, 1874, to Jan. 7, 1876; John S. Pillsbury, Jan. 7, 1876, to Jan. 10, 1882; Lucius F. Hubbard, Jan 10, 1882, to Jan. – , 1886; A. R. McGill, Jan. – , 1887, to – .
Lafayette Emmett, May 24, 1858, to Jan. 10, 1865; Thomas Wilson, Jan. 10, 1865, to July 14, 1869; James Gilfillan, July 14, 1869, to Jan. 7, 1870; Christopher G. Ripley, Jan. 7, 1870, to April 7, 1874; S. J. R. McMillan, April 7, 1874, to March 10, 1875; James Gilfillan, March, 10, 1875, to – .
Charles E. Flandrau, May, 24, 1858, to July 5, 1864; Isaac Atwater, May 24, 1858, to July 6, 1864; S. J. R. McMillan, July 6, 1864, to April 7, 1874; Thomas Wilson, July 6, 1864, to Jan. 10, 1865; John M. Berry, Jan. 10, 1865, to – ; George B. Young, April 16, 1874, to Jan. 11, 1875; F. R. E. Cornell, Jan 11, 1875, to May 23, 1881; D. A. Dickenson, June 27, 1881, to – ; Greenleaf Clark, March 14, 1881, to Jan. 12, 1882; William Mitchell, March 14, 1881, to – ; C. E. Vanderburgh, Jan. 12, 1882, to – ; L. W. Collins, January, 1888, to – .